Governors’ details and Register of Interests – September 2017
Name of Governor or Associate member / Category of governor.When term of officebegins and ends / Appointing body / Membership of committee / Positions of responsibility / Relevant business interests that could present conflict of interest / Attendance at meetings Sept 2016 – July 2017
- Full Governors = FGB
- Curriculum=C
- Finance=F
- Pay=P
- HTPerformance Management
Melissa Klein / Co-opted
8/6/15 to 8/6/19 / Governing
Body /
- Curriculum
- Finance
- Headteacher Performance
- Management
- Pay
- Chair of Governors
- Safeguarding
- Literacy
Alderton Infant School / FGB=2
C=1
F=2
P=1
HT=2 / None
Vacancy / Co-opted / None
Brian Westbury / Co-opted
13/2/2015 to 13/2/19 / Governing
Body /
- Curriculum
- Finance
- Pay
- Chair of Curriculum
- Numeracy
C=
F=1
P=1 / None
Natalie Donovan / Parent
24/11/2016 to 24/11/2020 / Parents /
- Pupil Premium
Vacancy / Co-opted
Vacancy / Staff / Staff / None
Lauren Bayles / Parent
23/3/2016 to 23/3/20 / Parents /
- Curriculum
- Presentation of children’s books
C=1 / None
Sam Davies / Parent
10/1/2017 to 10/1/2021 / Parents / Finance / SEND / FGB=
F=1 / None
Mike Capon / Local Authority / Local Authority / Finance /
- Chair of Finance
List of Governors who have left the Governing Body within the last 5 years
Jane Fairhead / Parent / Resigned November 2015Stephanie Machin / Parent / Resigned June 2015
Maggie Sandford / Staff / ResignedJune 2015
NaheedSaddique / Parent / Resigned October 2016
Sally Saunders / Co-opted / Resigned March 2016
Julia Ryan / Co-opted / Resigned February 2017
Tony Heagren / Co-opted / Resigned August 2017
Stephen Murray / Co-opted / Resigned August 2017
Marian Tunstall / Staff / End of Term August 2017